Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Robinson, Lam, Anderson, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Sanchez, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, on or after January 1, 2018, the administration of specified antimicrobial drugs to cattle, swine, or poultry if, in the professional judgment of a licensed veterinarian, the administration is necessary for specified purposes; prohibiting specified antimicrobial drugs from being administered to cattle, swine, or poultry in a specified pattern or for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Agriculture each year to collect publicly available data on the use in the State of specified antimicrobial drugs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {380416/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Text - Chapter - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM