Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, D. Barnes, Crutchfield, Lehman, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health to be the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health and providing that the Office is an independent unit of the State, rather than a unit in the Department; requiring an annual report by December 1 of the Office's activities investigating fraud and waste of certain funds, referrals to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit, recoveries of mistaken claims paid in error, recoveries of the cost of benefits mistakenly paid, and regulatory changes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0963
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {736087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {736087/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Finance 53A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM