Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the sale of beer and wine for off-premises consumption by Class D beer and wine license holders in Carroll County to the discretion of the Board of License Commissioners for Carroll County.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373191/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {373191/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-102, 16-805 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:24 AM