Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Love, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, K. Young, Brooks, Cardin, Ebersole, Feldmark, Forbes, Guyton, Hettleman, Hill, C. Jackson, Metzgar, and Stein
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 276
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, the use of Class B fire-fighting foam that contain intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; providing that the Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain Class B fire-fighting foam or the discharge or other use of certain fire-fighting foam in emergency fire-fighting or prevention operations; requiring the use of nonfluorinated foam for fire-fighting training; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 276
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Environment - Use of Fire-Fighting Foam Containing Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances - Prohibition
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 276
Text - Chapter - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
(   6-1601 through 6-1605 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:58 PM
Click to return on the top page