Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a scholarship for the student representative of the Carroll County Board of Education; specifying that a student may not receive more than two scholarships of $3,500 each; requiring the scholarship to be used for certain purposes and to be paid directly to a certain institution; providing that the scholarship may not be considered compensation for certain purposes; allowing the student representative to be reimbursed for certain expenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0359
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {815465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {815465/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM