Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Carozza, Angel, Atterbeary, Dumais, Lisanti, Malone, and Sanchez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing penalties from 3 years to 5 years imprisonment for the crime of homicide by motor vehicle or vessel while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM