Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile
Sponsored by
Delegates Sophocleus, Carey, Chang, Dumais, and S. Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "DNA profile" for purposes of provisions of law concerning the admissibility of a DNA profile in a criminal proceeding; providing that a DNA profile is admissible for specified purposes if accompanied by a specified statement that analysis of genetic loci has been validated according to specified quality assurance standards of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218279/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Delegates Conaway, Queen, and Rey
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Cassilly, Muse, and Ramirez
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {218279/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Delegates Conaway, Queen, and Rey 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Cassilly, Muse, and Ramirez 62
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM