Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Lisanti, Chang, Fennell, Johnson, Krebs, Krimm, Rose, Shoemaker, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to certain members under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of a special disability retirement allowance; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0971 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 47
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {994065/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM