Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Aggravated Murder Court
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Glass, McComas, and McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to create an Aggravated Murder Court that shall have original and exclusive jurisdiction over all presentments or indictments for offenses previously punishable by death; vesting the judicial power of the State in the Aggravated Murder Court as the General Assembly may create by law; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM