Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Acevero, Boyce, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Gilchrist, Kelly, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug in feed or water to cattle, swine, or poultry unless ordered by a licensed veterinarian through a certain prescription or a veterinary feed directive; exempting dairy cattle on a farm operation with a herd size of fewer than 300 dairy cattle; requiring the Department of Agriculture, by January 1, 2021, to adopt regulations prohibiting the routine administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug to dairy cattle entering a dry cycle except in certain cases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {743520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (44-94)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-38)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Cox) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {743520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (44-94) 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {804232/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-38) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1005, 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM