Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Howard, and Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Library Development and Services in the Department of Education to establish the Deaf Culture Digital Library as the primary information center on deaf resources for library customers and staff in the State; and specifying the mission, duties, leadership, and responsibilities of the Deaf Culture Digital Library to include the formation of the Deaf Culture Digital Library Advisory Board to provide advice on initiatives that further advance the mission and goals of the Deaf Culture Digital Library.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {515465/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484932/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {515465/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {484932/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-105, 23-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM