Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person responsible for any premises from conducting, causing, permitting, or aiding an unruly social gathering; authorizing certain law enforcement officers to issue a citation for certain violations of the Act; specifying who may be issued a citation for certain violations; excluding a certain type of party or gathering from the prohibitions in the Act; providing certain circumstances constituting a certain defense; requiring that a citation include certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-801 through 10-805 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page