Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Bus Stops
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, if any early voting center is located within one-half mile of a fixed local bus route, buses operating on that route, shall, to the maximum extent practical, allow passengers to embark and disembark at the entrance of the early voting center during the times the center is open for voting.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935261/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Bus Stops
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {935261/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Bus Stops
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page