Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a performance audit evaluating specified Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission project management practices in Prince George's County; requiring the Office of Legislative Audits, before initiating the audit, to coordinate with the Commission to develop the scope of the audit and submit the scope of the audit to the Joint Audit Committee for approval; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-3)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-3) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM