Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized Removal
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Kittleman, Malone, and Rose
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to use reasonable force to remove an unattended cat or dog from a motor vehicle if the person reasonably believes that the health or safety of the dog or cat is imminently endangered, provided that the person contacts law enforcement, the fire department, or 9-1-1, leaves contact information and notice that emergency services have been contacted, and remains with the cat or dog until law enforcement or the fire department arrives.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1004.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM