Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Workplace Harassment Commission) and Delegate Jones
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain individuals granted special access to the State legislative complex from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Department of General Services, if requested, to revoke access granted to a person who violates certain provisions of the Act or a regulated lobbyist who violates a certain provision of law; providing that sexual harassment prevention training for employees of the University system of Maryland may consist of webinar, computer-based, or online training; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {924964/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {787873/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text - Chapter - Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1004, 20-1013, 20-601, 20-606, 20-611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM