Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Anderson, Beitzel, Ciliberti, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Jacobs, Kittleman, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, Rose, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible to receive supplemental prekindergarten State grants in fiscal years 2018 through 2020; making specified grants to Baltimore City Public Schools subject to Baltimore City providing specified local contributions; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to make specified disbursements; requiring a specified audit; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to develop a specified financial recovery plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1024
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Grant for Declining Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784664/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683321/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-13)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {849838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Grant for Declining Education Aid
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {784664/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Floor Amendment {683321/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (124-13) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {849838/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 58
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 58
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Post Passage 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text - Chapter - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 5-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM