Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey and D.E. Davis
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish customer choice shopping websites for electric and natural gas customers; requiring the Commission to use information from electric and natural gas suppliers to maintain the information on the websites; requiring the Commission to include a customer choice education section on its website; requiring each electricity or natural gas supplier that is actively seeking customers in a service territory to maintain at least one open offer on the Commission's website; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0517
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Customer Choice - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Customer Choice - Education
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {673696/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {667873/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501, 7-510.1, 7-510.2, 7-604.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM