Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a specified licensee may not complete the transfer of a specified rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under specified circumstances; requiring, before a specified transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to meet jointly with a specified licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; requiring a licensee to take specified actions when facilitating a transfer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM