Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Anti-Concurrent Causation Clause - Notice and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that issues a policy of homeowner's insurance in the State that contains an anti-concurrent causation clause to provide a policyholder with a notice; providing that the notice is not part of the policy or contract of insurance and does not create a private right of action; requiring specified committees of the General Assembly to study the handling by insurers and the National Flood Insurance Program of property insurance claims in cases where two or more factors could affect or cause the loss; requiring a report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Finance 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {807772/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-215 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM