Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain food supplement program to include the Food Supplement Employment and Training Program; requiring the food supplement program to provide Food Supplement Employment and Training Program benefits to eligible individuals for whom federal funding is not available; requiring the Governor to include $1,000,000 in the annual budget for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter for the Food Supplement Employment and Training Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:02 PM