Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Crutchfield, Bartlett, and Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to conduct a study on gender-based equity in prerelease programming and facilities in Maryland that examines certain matters; and requiring the Commissioner to report the results of the study by January 1, 2020, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {962319/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {302216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {962319/1 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Substitute Committee Amendment {302216/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM