Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual otherwise qualified for jury service living outside the United States be excused by a jury judge or jury commissioner from jury service for a certain period after submitting a certain affidavit under penalty of perjury stating the individual's foreign address, intended date of return to the United States, or that the individual has no determined date of return; and requiring a jury judge to summon the individual for jury service after a certain date or no earlier than 5 years after receipt of a certain affidavit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {752818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {752818/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM