Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Charles, Ivey, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study the options for economical storage of audio and video recordings made by body-worn cameras and make recommendations for storage considering the budget limitations of State, county, local, and campus law enforcement entities; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM