Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a certain stakeholder advisory group to develop a certain reading and dyslexia handbook; requiring the Department and the advisory stakeholder group to make a completed handbook available to the public by June 1, 2021, and to develop a list of recommended programs and materials that address certain needs; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; requiring the handbook and updates to be published and disseminated in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 10:15 AM