Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2020, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2021; requiring the development of tools and materials to address certain needs; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   1-101, 8-420 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM