Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the individual operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any provision of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining "vulnerable individual" as a pedestrian, including certain workers and emergency services personnel, an individual walking an animal, or an individual lawfully operating certain modes of transport; establishing certain financial penalties and including community service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0512
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0804 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 12:42 PM