Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Policy of Group Health Insurance - Associations
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Mautz, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that, for purposes of provisions of law concerning health insurance, a chamber of commerce may be considered an association; repealing certain provisions of law that apply certain provisions of law governing small group market plans to health benefit plans offered by certain entities; applying the Act to policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Policy of Group Health Insurance - Associations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Policy of Group Health Insurance - Associations
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601, 15-1201, 15-1202, 15-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM