Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Wilkins, Arikan, Buckel, Hornberger, Impallaria, Mangione, Miller, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to evaluate existing school civic literacy programs, determine a certain strategy, and make certain recommendations for a plan for implementing a civic education program to the State Department of Education, the Governor, and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1369 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 4:38 PM