Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Simmons
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a licensee engaged in the business of money transmission to provide specified training materials to specified agents annually on how to recognize financial abuse and financial exploitation of elder adults and how to respond appropriately to specified circumstances; requiring a licensee to provide specified materials to newly appointed agents within 1 month of the agent's appointment; requiring a licensee to include a clear, concise, and conspicuous fraud warning on all transmittal forms used to send money; providing an exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523193/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {523193/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {127379/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-401, 12-413, 12-413.1, 12-416, 12-425, 12-426, 1-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM