Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Acevero, Atterbeary, Boyce, Cain, Carr, Conaway, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Ivey, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide technical assistance and training to county boards of education regarding the use of restorative approaches on request; requiring certain regulations to incorporate the use of restorative approaches; requiring the State Department of Education to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly, on or before October 1 of each year, a student discipline data report that includes a description of restorative approaches in the State and a review of disciplinary practices and policies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0766
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175562/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984330/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {153823/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {623523/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {175562/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {984330/1 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {984330/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {153823/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {623523/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM