Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Malone, R. Watson, and J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a certain formula for the calculation of a certain child support obligation under the child support guidelines when a parent with shared physical custody keeps the child or children overnight for more than 25%, at least 92 overnights, but less than 30%, not more than 109 overnights, of the year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {782818/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM