Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Increasing certain tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; imposing a sales and use tax rate of 12% on electronic smoking devices; requiring the Governor to include at least $18,250,000 in the annual budget for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter for certain smoking cessation activities; requiring the Comptroller to distribute certain revenue attributable to certain taxes to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; imposing a tax on certain revenues from certain digital advertising services in the State; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means Economic Matters
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915466/2 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-44)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549037/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {433624/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {679237/1 Budget and Taxation Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {363920/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (29-16)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Reassigned to Ways and Means Economic Matters 19
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {915466/2 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (89-44) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {549037/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {433624/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {679237/1 Budget and Taxation Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {363920/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (29-16) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.5-101, 16.7-101 )
(   5-219 )
(   11-104, 12-101, 12-102, 12-105, 12-201, 12-302, 2-1303, 2-1602.1 )
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:35 PM