Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis and Moon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study the options for economical storage of audio and video recordings made by body-worn cameras and make recommendations for storage considering the budget limitations of State, county, local, and campus law enforcement jurisdictions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0717 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {622913/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-5)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {622913/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-5) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM