Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, McDermott, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Hough, K. Kelly, and Mitchell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a police officer to charge by citation for sale of an alcoholic beverage to an underage drinker or intoxicated person, malicious destruction of property if the amount of damage to property is less than $500, and theft of property or services with a value of less than $1,000; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0991
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412010/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {412010/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM