Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a simple majority of the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to approve or deny an application for a per diem license in a certain formal meeting or, with a certain written voting record, through oral or written contact by any method by the chair with each member of the Board; and prohibiting the Board from requiring the publication of an application for a per diem license as a prerequisite to issuing the license.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (122-0) 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-1301, 22-1309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM