Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Bridges, Cardin, Carr, Charles, Conaway, Crutchfield, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Hettleman, Ivey, Jackson, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Stewart, Sydnor, Turner, Washington, R. Watson, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each correctional facility to have a written policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses the use of medical isolation or restrictive housing for certain purposes during pregnancy and during a certain post-pregnancy period; establishing that a pregnant inmate may not be involuntarily placed in certain restrictive housing, with certain exceptions; providing that a certain pregnant inmate may be placed in certain restrictive housing if a certain managing official makes a certain determination; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332711/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {332711/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-601, 9-601.1, 9-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM