Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Bagnall, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Jalisi, Kaiser, Korman, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, K. Young, Anderton, Boyce, Harrison, Healey, Jacobs, Lierman, Attar, Ciliberti, Holmes, Lehman, Parrott, Ruth, Wells
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 310
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Codifying the Bikeways Network Program; specifying that the Program is to provide grant support for bicycle network development activities; requiring the Department of Transportation to establish application and eligibility criteria for the Program; and renaming the Program to be the Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {210110/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 310
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {210110/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 310
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:39 PM