Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court, in a custody or visitation proceeding, to deny custody or visitation rights to a certain party if the court has reasonable ground to believe that a child has been abused or neglected by the party, unless the court specifically finds that there is no likelihood of further child abuse or neglect by the party and states the reasons for the finding; authorizing the court to approve a supervised visitation arrangement under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-13)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {672117/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (120-13) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page