Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a specified property tax credit to supplement the State homeowners' property tax credit; providing for the calculation of the credit; prohibiting the county from granting the credit under specified circumstances; providing that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is responsible for specified administrative duties with respect to the credit; requiring the county to reimburse the Department for the reasonable cost of administering the property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-215, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM