Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Board of Education – Oversight by the Baltimore County Office of the Inspector General
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the Baltimore County Board of Education is subject to the jurisdiction of the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General; specifying the matters for which the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General may receive and investigate complaints concerning the Baltimore County Board of Education; requiring the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General to provide a report of an investigation, on request, to certain entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County – Board of Education – Oversight by the Baltimore County Office of the Inspector General
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-138 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page