Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Food Donation Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending through December 31, 2023, the taxable years for which a qualified farm may claim a certain credit against the Maryland income tax for the donation of fresh farm products for human consumption; extending through December 31, 2023, the period of time during which the State Department of Agriculture may issue certain tax credit certificates; extending through December 31, 2024, the period of time for which the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with the Comptroller, shall submit a certain report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Food Donation Pilot Program - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Food Donation Pilot Program - Extension
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 8:58 PM
Click to return on the top page