Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources, on a showing by an applicant for long-term care Medicaid benefits that the applicant has been unable to obtain from a specified fiduciary institution financial records related to financial and real property assets necessary to establish the applicant's eligibility or ineligibility for Medicaid benefits, to request the records; requiring the Department to adopt regulations stating the requirements an applicant must satisfy for the Department to request financial records; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407876/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {134361/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Finance 44
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {407876/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM