Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the authority of the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt regulations to manage, for training and quality control purposes, the monitoring and recording of incoming telephone conversations to the Member Services division of the State Retirement Agency and to include outgoing telephone conversations initiated by a certain automated virtual hold callback feature of the automated system.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0463
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 28
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:04 PM