Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a ground lease holder may not bring any suit, action, or proceeding against the current leasehold tenant or a former leasehold tenant to recover the ground rent that was due and owing before the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title to the leasehold interest if the ground lease was not registered in accordance with certain law prior to the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title, notwithstanding any other provision of law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-707, 8-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM