Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Ali, Conaway, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Sanchez, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a campaign finance entity that receives a contribution in violation of a certain prohibition on contributions in the name of another person from using the contribution; requiring the campaign finance entity to remit the illegal contribution to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to credit the illegal contribution to the Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435764/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Illegal Contributions - Fair Campaign Financing Fund
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {435764/1 Adopted 38
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 38
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing Fund
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text - Chapter - Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-239.1, 13-602, 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM