Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception to the general prohibition against recording or broadcasting a criminal sentencing hearing; establishing requirements that a media organization file a certain written request to provide media coverage of a criminal sentencing hearing with the clerk of the court at least 24 hours before the hearing is scheduled to begin; requiring the clerk of court to provide notice of the request to each party involved in the criminal proceeding; providing certain factors that a presiding judge may consider; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM