Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, with a certain exception, a member of the Board of Directors of the Maryland School for the Blind who serves three consecutive terms from being reappointed for 1 year after completion of those terms; and authorizing the immediate reappointment of the Chairman of the Board after completion of three consecutive terms.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0640
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Text - Chapter - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:04 PM