Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegate Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies to study efforts made to reduce impaired driving in the last 20 years, current initiatives, national best practices, and new technologies to combat impaired driving; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding new State initiatives, public awareness efforts, and improved coordination and to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0310 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 5:24 PM