Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Boyce, Crutchfield, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Grammer, Healey, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Lopez, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Pippy, Reznik, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an investigation during the course of an investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with, or with a certain person requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties; and establishing a certain exception to the prohibition under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {432419/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 12:31 PM